HI HB2197 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-17 - Act 111, on 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1211).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-17 - Act 111, on 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1211).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the definition of "advance gambling activity" to repeal playing or participating in any form of gambling activity. Amends the requisite state of mind for promoting gambling in the first and second degree to recklessness and criminal negligence, respectively. Amends the offenses of promoting gambling in the first and second degree to a class B felony and class C felony, respectively. Amends the offense of gambling to repeal advancing any gambling activity. Excludes the offenses of promoting gambling in the first and second degree from qualifying for deferred acceptance of guilty plea or nolo contendere plea. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Gambling.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-28 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-17 | House | Act 111, on 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1211). |
2022-06-17 | Senate | Act 111, 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1211). |
2022-05-04 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 824). |
2022-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 946). |
2022-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso voting no (2) and none excused (0). |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-22. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 51-22). |
2022-04-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-03-22. |
2022-04-28 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 51-22) as amended in (CD 1). |
2022-04-28 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Kitagawa, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-27 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-28-22 2:20PM in conference room 325. |
2022-04-26 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 917). |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Rhoads Chair; Kim, Fevella. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 718). |
2022-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Matayoshi Chair; Kitagawa, Ward. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 715). |
2022-04-14 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2022-04-12 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 835) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio, Fevella. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-22. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3847) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fevella. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 03-30-22 10:45AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-29-22 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Re-Referred to JDC. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 328). |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Perruso voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, McDermott voting no (2) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-03 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Perruso voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, McDermott, Todd excused (3). |
2022-03-03 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 786-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2022-02-10 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, LoPresti. |
2022-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-10-22 2:00PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-08 | House | The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-10-22. |
2022-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-08-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |