HI HB219 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB219
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of human services to implement an earned income disregard program as an intermediate step to implementing a medicaid buy-in program. Requires reports to the legislature. Takes effect upon approval by the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services. (HB219 HD1)
Title
Relating To Persons With Disabilities.
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 672) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-14 | House | The committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Belatti, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura. |
2019-02-12 | House | Bill re-scheduled to be heard by HSH on Thursday, 02-14-19 9:00AM in conference room 329. |
2019-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSH on Thursday, 02-14-19 8:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to HSH, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2019-01-18 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB219 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
SB950 (Same As) 2019-02-07 - The committee(s) on HMS deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-08-19 3:00PM in conference room 016.
SB950 (Same As) 2019-02-07 - The committee(s) on HMS deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-08-19 3:00PM in conference room 016.