HI HB2189 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-31 - The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-31 - The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the agricultural theft enforcement program and agricultural theft enforcement special fund within the Department of Agriculture. Authorizes the Board of Agriculture and agricultural theft enforcement officers to exercise police powers. Extends to the agricultural theft enforcement program the applicability of certain statutory provisions relating to the law enforcement officer independent review board; possession of electric guns; the law enforcement standards board; emergency vehicles; and worker's compensation for volunteer emergency response personnel. Authorizes the use of funds in the agricultural development and food security special fund for protection of agricultural resources. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To Agriculture.
Sponsors
Rep. Sean Quinlan [D] | Rep. Daniel Holt [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] |
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-31 | House | The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2020-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 01-31-20 9:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to AGR, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2282 (Same As) 2020-03-11 - The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Agricultural Theft Enforcement Program
Agricultural Theft Enforcement Special Fund
Appropriation ($)
HDOA
Law Enforcement
Agricultural Theft Enforcement Special Fund
Appropriation ($)
HDOA
Law Enforcement
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2189&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB2189_.HTM |