HI HB2185 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-06 - The committee(s) on AGR/WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-06 - The committee(s) on AGR/WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Part I: Authorizes the State to exchange lands for certain agricultural and conservation lands owned by Dole Food Company, Inc. Part II: Establishes the east Kapolei community development district. Part III: Establishes the Whitmore project facility revenue bond special fund into which proceeds from revenue bonds shall be deposited for purchasing certain parcels of land from Dole Food Company, Inc. Appropriates funds to acquire certain Dole Food lands.
Title
Exchange for Conservation Lands; Whitmore Project Facility Revenue Bond Special Fund; Dole Food Company; East Kapolei Community Development District; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-06 | House | The committee(s) on AGR/WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2014-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR/WAL on Thursday, 02-06-14 9:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2014-01-30 | House | Re-referred to AGR/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 10 |
2014-01-27 | House | Referred to AGR, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2014-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2185&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB2185_.HTM |