HI HB218 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Excepts from the definition of historic property any private residence that has not been entered, or nominated by the owner of the residence for entry, onto the Hawaii register of historic places. Clarifies that nothing in chapter 6E, Hawaii Revised Statutes, shall be construed to require review by the Department of Land and Natural Resources for a private residence fifty or more years old that has not been entered, or nominated by the owner of the residence for entry, onto the Hawaii register of historic places.
Title
DLNR; Historic Preservation; Review; Private Residence
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2015-01-23 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB645 (Same As) 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to HEA, WLA.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=218&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB218_.HTM |