HI HB2171 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a framework for the regulation of electric foot scooters by the State and counties. Amends definitions of "moped" to exclude electric foot scooters.
Title
Relating To Electric Foot Scooters.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2995 (Same As) 2020-03-09 - Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 36
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2171&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB2171_.HTM |