HI HB217 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB217
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-23 - Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-24-19 3:30PM in conference room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-23 - Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-24-19 3:30PM in conference room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that when an officer has custody of a child under the age of 16 for an alleged violation of law, the child shall have contact with legal counsel or a parent or legal guardian before the child waives any constitutional rights and before any custodial interrogation. Effective 1/28/2081. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Children.
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-24-19 3:30PM in conference room 325. |
2019-04-22 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 948). |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: K. Rhoads Chair; Wakai, Fevella. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 815). |
2019-04-17 | House | House Conferees Changed: Representative Luke added as Co-Chair. Representative C. Lee discharged as Chair; Added as Co-Chair. |
2019-04-17 | House | Re-referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 54 |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808). |
2019-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: C. Lee Chair; Morikawa, Thielen. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804). |
2019-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2019-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 704) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1883) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-19 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 353). |
2019-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-02-28 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). |
2019-02-28 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 953) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-02-13 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, McKelvey, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Morikawa. |
2019-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-13-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-02-11 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-13-19. |
2019-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 02-11-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 2 |
2019-01-18 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB217 (Carry Over) 2019-04-23 - Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-24-19 3:30PM in conference room 325.