HI HB2166 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, McDermott, Nakamura, Souki, Todd excused (6).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, McDermott, Nakamura, Souki, Todd excused (6).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation to establish a housing voucher program for full-time classroom teachers employed by the Department of Education or by a public charter school. (HB2166 HD1)
Title
Relating To Housing Vouchers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, McDermott, Nakamura, Souki, Todd excused (6). |
2018-02-15 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 527-18), recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-02-12 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kong, Creagan, Hashem, McKelvey, Ohno, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Learmont, Onishi; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, Quinlan. |
2018-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Monday, 02-12-18 2:10PM in House conference room 309. |
2018-02-06 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EDN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Souki excused (3). |
2018-02-06 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 105-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EDN. |
2018-02-01 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Nakamura, Aquino, Hashem, San Buenaventura, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan. |
2018-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Thursday, 02-01-18 9:00AM in House conference room 423. |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to HSG, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 8 |
2018-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |