HI HB2165 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-19 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 801).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-19 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 801).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the University of Hawaii Promise Program to provide scholarships for the unmet direct cost needs of qualified students enrolled at any campus of the University of Hawaii system or any community college campus. Appropriates funds to establish and implement the program. Creates a special fund. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The University Of Hawaii Promise Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 801). |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: K. Kahele Chair; Galuteria, S. Chang Co-Chairs. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: McKelvey, Gates Co-Chairs; Quinlan, Matsumoto. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2018-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 677) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-18. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3699) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-04-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-06-18 11:00AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3194) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Kim, S. Chang, Keith-Agaran, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE will hold a public decision making on 03-22-18 1:22PM in conference room 224. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | The committee on HRE deferred the measure. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-18 1:20PM in conference room 224. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Referred to HRE, WAM. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 81). |
2018-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Quinlan, Yamane excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 806-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-22 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2018-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-22-18 12:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 623-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-02-13 | House | The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Hashem, Creagan, Kong, Learmont, Ohno, Onishi, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, Quinlan. |
2018-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 02-13-18 2:10PM in House conference room 309. |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 8 |
2018-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |