HI HB2161 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-28 - Referred to LAT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Labor & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-28 - Referred to LAT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Labor & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds into the unemployment compensation trust fund.
Title
Relating To The Unemployment Compensation Trust Fund.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to LAT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3129 (Same As) 2022-03-24 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2161&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB2161_.HTM |