HI HB215 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB215
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-10 - The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-10 - The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the sale, offer for sale, display for sale, trade, or distribution of certain animal fur products in the State. Effective 1/1/2024.
Title
Relating To Animal Fur Products.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-10 | House | The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2023-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 02-10-23 10:00AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-25 | House | Referred to AGR, JHA, referral sheet 1 |
2023-01-20 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB215 (Carry Over) 2023-02-10 - The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SB682 (Same As) 2023-04-28 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-23 4:30PM; Conference Room 309
SB682 (Same As) 2023-04-28 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-23 4:30PM; Conference Room 309
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=215&year=2023 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2023/bills/HB215_.HTM |