HI HB2149 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Act 198, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1307).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Act 198, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1307).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the ethics training requirement for dentists in the continuing education program to be six hours of ethics training within the previous two years for each biennial renewal period. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Dentistry.
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] |
Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Rep. Scott Saiki [D] | Rep. Roy Takumi [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-11 | House | Act 198, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1307). |
2018-07-11 | Senate | Act 198, 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1307). |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 675). |
2018-04-25 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2018-04-25 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Quinlan excused (2). |
2018-04-25 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 666). |
2018-04-24 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-10-18. |
2018-04-20 | House | The House Conference Managers recommend to agree to the Senate Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Ohno, Takumi, Choy, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-20-18 9:05AM in conference room 229. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-19-18 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 785). |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Ihara, Nishihara. |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Mizuno, Ohno, Takumi Co-Chairs; Choy, Tupola. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 546). |
2018-04-10 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-06 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 565) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-06-18. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3424) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Tokuda, S. Chang, Espero, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Ruderman. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | The committee on CPH has rescheduled its decision making to 03-28-18 9:15AM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 03-28-18 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-18 9:15AM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 192). |
2018-03-02 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, San Buenaventura, Say, Yamane excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1007-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-21 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Ito, Johanson, LoPresti, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka, Yamane, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-02-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-21-18 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2018-02-16 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported from IAC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 654-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to CPC. |
2018-02-14 | House | The committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Choy, Cachola, Fukumoto, Ito, Onishi, Tokioka, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti. |
2018-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by IAC on Wednesday, 02-14-18 9:00AM in House conference room 429. |
2018-02-06 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on IAC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Souki excused (3). |
2018-02-06 | House | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 83-18), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to IAC. |
2018-02-02 | House | The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Belatti, Learmont, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHS on Friday, 02-02-18 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to HHS, IAC, CPC, referral sheet 8 |
2018-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2931 (Same As) 2018-03-23 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).