HI HB2148 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-12 - Re-referred to IAC/CPC, JUD, referral sheet 23
Pending: House Intrastate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-12 - Re-referred to IAC/CPC, JUD, referral sheet 23
Pending: House Intrastate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits teachers and persons who are licensed to provide professional counseling from engaging in or advertising sexual orientation change efforts on students and persons under eighteen years of age.
Title
Relating To Minors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-12 | House | Re-referred to IAC/CPC, JUD, referral sheet 23 |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to EDN, IAC/CPC, JUD, referral sheet 8 |
2018-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2148&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB2148_.HTM |