HI HB2145 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Act 197, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1306).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Act 197, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1306).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the synchronization of plan participants' medications. Requires plans, policies, contracts, or agreements that are offered by health insurers, mutual benefit societies, and health maintenance organizations and provide prescription drug benefits, to apply prorated daily cost-sharing rates for prescriptions dispensed by network pharmacies for less than a thirty-day supply. (HB2145 CD1)
Title
Relating To Medication Synchronization.
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] |
Rep. Bertrand Kobayashi [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. Lei Learmont [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-11 | House | Act 197, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1306). |
2018-07-11 | Senate | Act 197, 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1306). |
2018-04-30 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 698). |
2018-04-27 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 846). |
2018-04-27 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Thielen, Tupola excused (3). |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Ruderman. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-27-18. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 4-18). |
2018-04-25 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Friday, 04-27-18. |
2018-04-25 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 4-18) as amended in (CD 1). |
2018-04-20 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2018-04-20 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Takumi, Kobayashi, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-20-18 9:05AM in conference room 229. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-19-18 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 785). |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Espero, Ihara. |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Mizuno, Takumi, Kobayashi Co-Chairs; Tupola. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 398). |
2018-03-29 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-03-28 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 453) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | The committee on WAM has deleted the measure from decision making scheduled on 03-29-18 10:50AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-28-18. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Waived referral to WAM. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-29-18 10:50AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3128) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Nishihara, Ruderman. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-20-18 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 76). |
2018-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Yamane excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 810-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-23 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Fukumoto, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Nakamura, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Gates, Lowen, Todd, Tupola, Ward. |
2018-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-23-18 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-14 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2018-02-14 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 439-18), recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-02-12 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Johanson, LoPresti, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ito, McDermott. |
2018-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-12-18 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2018-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola excused (2). |
2018-02-08 | House | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 184-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2018-02-06 | House | The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Belatti, Learmont, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHS on Tuesday, 02-06-18 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to HHS, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 8 |
2018-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |