HI HB2140 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Referred to EET/TEC, WAM.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Referred to EET/TEC, WAM.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism to develop and implement an investment in innovative technologies plan to support the advancement of innovative technologies in the areas of energy, transportation, agriculture, and water. Appropriates funds. Takes effect on 7/1/2112. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Investment In Innovative Technologies.
Sponsors
Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. Cedric Gates [D] | Rep. Daniel Holt [D] | Rep. Lisa Kitagawa [D] |
Rep. David Tarnas [D] | Rep. Gene Ward [R] | Rep. Tina Wildberger [D] | Rep. Val Okimoto [R] |
Rep. Justin Woodson [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Economic Development & Business: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Economic Development & Business: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Senate | Referred to EET/TEC, WAM. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 65). |
2020-02-27 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Kong excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-27 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 709-20), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-20 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-20-20 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2020-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2). |
2020-02-14 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 600-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-02-05 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kitagawa, Ichiyama, Quinlan, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Johanson, Matsumoto. |
2020-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-05-20 9:30AM in conference room 309. |
2020-01-31 | House | The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-05-20. |
2020-01-28 | House | Bill re-scheduled to be heard by EDB on Friday, 01-31-20 9:30AM in conference room 309. |
2020-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Friday, 01-31-20 8:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |