HI HB2137 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-28 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-28 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows an adopted individual to benefit both by relationship through a natural parent and through an adoptive parent in a disposition or other designation as provided for in accordance with the Hawaiian Homes Commission Act, 1920, as amended, or administrative rules. Allows the adopted individual and individual's natural family to continue having the same familial relationship.
Title
Relating To Adoption.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3105 (Same As) 2022-02-09 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2137&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB2137_.HTM |