HI HB2132 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-07 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Yamashita excused (2).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a water sports equipment decal program within the Department of Land and Natural Resources. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Department Of Land And Natural Resources.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-05 - House - House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-07HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Yamashita excused (2).
2020-02-07HouseReported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 221-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2020-02-05HouseThe committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Har, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2020-01-31HouseBill scheduled to be heard by WLH on Wednesday, 02-05-20 9:00AM in House conference room 325.
2020-01-27HouseReferred to WLH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 5
2020-01-21HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2020-01-17HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback