HI HB213 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Act 128, on 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1229).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Act 128, on 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1229).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits an employee to take family leave in order to care for the employee's sibling with a serious health condition. Specifies notice and certification requirements. (HB213 CD1)
Title
Relating To Family Leave.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-11 | House | Act 128, on 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1229). |
2017-07-11 | Senate | Act 128, 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1229). |
2017-05-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642). |
2017-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737). |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kong, Tupola, Ward voting no (3) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17. |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 138). |
2017-04-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17. |
2017-04-28 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 138) as amended in (CD 1). |
2017-04-26 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) K. Rhoads. |
2017-04-26 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Cullen, Holt, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-17 1:30PM in conference room 325. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-17 1:30PM in conference room 325. |
2017-04-19 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-20-17 1:45PM in conference room 325. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Tokuda Co-Chair; K. Rhoads. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586). |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 585). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Johanson, Cullen Co-Chairs; Holt, Matsumoto. |
2017-04-13 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2017-04-11 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 554) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-11-17. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1557) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Riviere ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-31-17 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1073) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Kim; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-17 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 27). |
2017-03-02 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kong voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 739), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-02-22 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Quinlan, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Choy, Tokioka, Tupola. |
2017-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-22-17 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2). |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 697) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-14 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Keohokalole, Nakashima, Takumi, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-14-17 8:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2017-01-20 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |