HI HB2126 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-11 - The committee(s) on HED recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-11 - The committee(s) on HED recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for the design and construction of the Manoa Learning Exchange. Effective July 1, 2014.
Title
University of Hawaii; CIP ($)
Sponsors
Rep. Isaac Choy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-11 | House | The committee(s) on HED recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2014-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 02-11-14 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2014-01-23 | House | Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2014-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2904 (Same As) 2014-02-06 - The committee on HRE deferred the measure.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2126&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB2126_.HTM |