HI HB2121 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-04 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes ranked choice voting for special federal elections and special elections of vacant county council seats.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Ranked Choice Voting.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-04HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2020-02-03HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-04-20 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2020-02-03HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-04-20 at 2:00pm.
2020-01-31HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 02-03-20 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
2020-01-27HouseReferred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5
2020-01-21HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2020-01-17HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB2006 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:00PM in conference room 325.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback