HI HB2121 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 10 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-23 - (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 795).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 10 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-23 - (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 795).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases maximum allowable customer-generator capacity for net energy metering systems to two megawatts if the generating facility is sited on property owned or controlled by the State of Hawaii. Increases maximum allowable customer-generator capacity for net energy metering systems to one megawatt for all other systems. Takes effect on July 1, 2013, and repeals if the public utilities commission issues an order or decision earlier pursuant to docket 2007-0176 or 2011-0206, which relate to the implementation of the intragovernmental wheeling of electricity and the reliability standards for certain electric companies, respectively. (SD1)
Title
Net Energy Metering; Renewable Energy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-23 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 795). | |
2012-04-23 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Gabbard, Chair; Baker, Ige, Co-Chair(s); Kouchi, Slom. | |
2012-04-17 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 612). | |
2012-04-16 | (H) House conferees appointed: Coffman, Herkes, Oshiro Co-Chairs; Choy, Yamashita, Riviere. | |
2012-04-16 | (H) Re-referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 65 | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 547). | |
2012-04-12 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2012-04-10 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 571) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2012-04-10 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-04-05 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-12. | |
2012-04-05 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2012-04-05 | (S) Reported from ENE/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3183) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2012-04-03 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Green, Nishihara, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Slom. | |
2012-04-03 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, English, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Slom. | |
2012-03-28 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 04-03-12 3:00PM in conference room 225. | |
2012-03-23 | (S) Re-Referred to ENE/CPN. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Referred to ENE, WAM. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 130). | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Morikawa, Souki voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fontaine, Hanohano, Pine, Thielen, Ward, Wooley voting no (6) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 906-12) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-03-01 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Giugni, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2012-02-29 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-29-12 5:15PM in conference room 308. | |
2012-02-28 | (H) The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-29-12. | |
2012-02-27 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2012-02-24 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-28-12 2:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2012-02-17 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Ching, Hanohano, C. Lee voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pine, Thielen voting no (2) and Representative(s) Herkes, Kawakami, M. Lee, Mizuno, Morikawa excused (5). | |
2012-02-17 | (H) Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 592-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2012-02-16 | (H) The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Coffman, Kawakami, Cabanilla, Chang, Ito, Nakashima, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Har, Herkes, Thielen. | |
2012-02-14 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-16-12 11:30AM in conference room 325. | |
2012-02-09 | (H) The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | |
2012-02-06 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-09-12 8:30AM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-01-20 | (H) Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 4 | |
2012-01-20 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-19 | (H) Pending introduction. |