HI HB2113 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - (S) Act 319, 7/10/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1436).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Bans the ignition, possession, selling, offering for sale, and use of aerial luminaries. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fireworks; Aerial Luminaries Package

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-07-10 (S) Act 319, 7/10/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1436).
2012-07-10 (H) Act 319, on 7/10/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1436).
2012-05-07 (H) Transmitted to Governor.
2012-05-04 (S) Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 727).
2012-05-03 (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2012-05-03 (H) House agrees to Senate amendment(s).
2012-05-01 (S) Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 717).
2012-05-01 (H) Reconsideration of action taken on 04-12-12.
2012-04-26 (H) The House Conference Managers recommend to agree to the Senate Amendments. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Rhoads, Cullen, M. Lee, Yamane, Fontaine; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2012-04-24 (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-26-12 11:00AM in conference room 312.
2012-04-20 (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-24-12 3:30PM in conference room 312.
2012-04-19 (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-20-12 4:05PM in conference room 312.
2012-04-17 (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 758).
2012-04-17 (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Espero, Chair; Shimabukuro, Kidani, Co-Chair(s); Ihara, Slom.
2012-04-17 (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 612).
2012-04-16 (H) House conferees appointed: Aquino, Rhoads, Cullen Co-Chairs; M. Lee, Yamane, Fontaine.
2012-04-16 (H) Re-referred to PBM, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 65
2012-04-13 (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 547).
2012-04-12 (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2012-04-10 (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 570) in amended form (SD 1).
2012-04-10 (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2012-04-05 (S) One Day Notice 04-10-12.
2012-04-05 (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3306) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2012-03-29 (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi.
2012-03-27 (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-29-12 9:00AM in conference room 211.
2012-03-23 (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2012-03-23 (S) Reported from PGM/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2971) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2012-03-21 (S) The committee(s) on PGM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PGM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Ryan, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Baker.
2012-03-21 (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Gabbard.
2012-03-14 (S) The committee(s) on PGM/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-12 10:05AM in conference room 016.
2012-03-08 (S) Referred to PGM/JDL, WAM.
2012-03-08 (S) Passed First Reading.
2012-03-08 (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 129).
2012-03-06 (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2012-03-02 (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-06-12.
2012-03-02 (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 708-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2012-02-23 (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Cabanilla, Carroll, Ito, McKelvey, Souki, Tsuji, Fontaine, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Brower, Coffman, Herkes, Luke.
2012-02-21 (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-23-12 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2012-02-17 (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Herkes, Kawakami, M. Lee, Mizuno, Morikawa excused (5).
2012-02-17 (H) Reported from PBM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 604-12), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2012-02-16 (H) The committees on PBM recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Cullen, Ichiyama, Luke, Takai, Yamashita, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) M. Lee, Saiki, Souki, Takumi.
2012-02-13 (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by PBM on Thursday, 02-16-12 9:00AM in House conference room 309.
2012-01-20 (H) Referred to PBM, JUD, referral sheet 4
2012-01-20 (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading.
2012-01-19 (H) Pending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB2152 (Same As) 2012-01-20 - (S) Referred to PGM/JDL, WAM.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback