HI HB2099 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-16 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-16 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Agriculture to conduct a feasibility study on the establishment of ag-tech zones within the City and County of Honolulu. Appropriates funds for conducting the feasibility study. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Agriculture.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Creagan, Evans, DeCoite Co-Chairs; Thielen. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2018-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 661) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-18. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3575) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-18 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Reported from PSM/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3018) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) K. Rhoads ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Baker. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-18 1:30PM in conference room 224. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Referred to PSM/AEN, WAM. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 72). |
2018-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Yamane excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 841-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-22 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Tupola. |
2018-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-22-18 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-16 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 637-18), recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-02-14 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Keohokalole, Holt, Ichiyama, Johanson, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Wednesday, 02-14-18 9:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2018-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EDB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, McDermott, Souki, Tupola, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-09 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 236-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EDB. |
2018-02-07 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Gates, Say, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ing. |
2018-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 02-07-18 8:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to AGR, EDB, FIN, referral sheet 7 |
2018-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |