HI HB2097 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-24 - Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-24 - Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the definition of "power-generating facility" for the purposes of environmental impact assessments to include new combustion electricity-generating facilities operating beginning January 1, 2024, that were not previously operational. Includes power-generating facilities that are converting from one source of energy to another source, where the new source requires combustion and the electrical output rating of the converted facility exceeds 5.0 megawatts.
Title
Relating To Energy.
Sponsors
Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Rep. Terez Amato [D] | Rep. Elle Cochran [D] | Rep. Jeanne Kapela [D] |
Rep. Lisa Marten [D] | Rep. Amy Perruso [D] | Rep. Chris Todd [D] | Rep. Justin Woodson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 2 |
2024-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2367 (Same As) 2024-01-22 - Referred to EET, CPN.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2097&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB2097_.HTM |