HI HB2093 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-22 - Act 095, 06/21/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1196).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-22 - Act 095, 06/21/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1196).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of special purpose revenue bonds for projects of Goodwill Industries of Hawaii, Inc., and its affiliates. (HB2093 CD1)
Title
Special Purpose Revenue Bonds; Goodwill Industries of Hawaii ($)
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Rep. Matthew Lopresti [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-22 | Senate | Act 095, 06/21/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1196). |
2016-06-22 | House | Act 095, on 06/21/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1196). |
2016-05-05 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2016-05-04 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 715). |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2016-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2016-04-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-16. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 31-16). |
2016-04-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-16. |
2016-04-28 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 31-16) as amended in (CD 1). |
2016-04-27 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Chun Oakland; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2016-04-27 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Kobayashi, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-21 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-27-16 2:00PM in conference room 423. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 620). |
2016-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 656). |
2016-04-19 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-21-16 2:00PM in conference room 423. |
2016-04-19 | House | House conferee(s) replaced: Representative(s) McDermott replaced Representative(s) Fukumoto Chang as conferee(s). |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; Chun Oakland Co-Chair; Slom. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Morikawa, Kobayashi Co-Chairs; Fukumoto Chang. |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2016-04-14 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2016-04-12 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 570) in amended form (SD 2). |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Transmitted to House. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-16. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3509) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2016-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, Galuteria, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-16 9:15AM in conference room 211. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3120) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2016-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Slom, Espero, Ihara, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Ruderman, L. Thielen. |
2016-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-16 1:20PM in conference room 414. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to EET, WAM. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 112). |
2016-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Saiki, Tupola excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 742-16), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite. |
2016-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-25-16 1:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2016-02-18 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Luke, Nakashima, Souki excused (3). |
2016-02-18 | House | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 428-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-02-16 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Kobayashi, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan, Oshiro; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Fukumoto Chang. |
2016-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Tuesday, 02-16-16 11:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2016-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |