HI HB2090 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-18 - The committee on TRS deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-18 - The committee on TRS deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a zero-emission vehicle rebate program within the public utilities commission to enable low- and moderate-income families greater access to zero-emission vehicles by providing a rebate on the point-of-sale purchase price of zero-emission vehicles. Effective 7/1/2100. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Zero Emission Transportation.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-18 | Senate | The committee on TRS deferred the measure. |
2022-03-18 | Senate | The committee on EET deferred the measure. |
2022-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET/TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-22 3:10PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred to EET/TRS, CPN/WAM. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 181). |
2022-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 826-22), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, McDermott. |
2022-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-25-22 1:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-18 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Kapela excused (2). |
2022-02-18 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 599-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2022-02-16 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Hashem, Mizuno, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Har, Kong, Morikawa, Onishi; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2022-02-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-16-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-10 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2022-02-10 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 177-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2022-02-08 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Matayoshi, Perruso, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-08-22 8:50AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3058 (Same As) 2022-01-26 - Referred to EET/TRS, CPN/WAM.