HI HB2090 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates March 29th of each year as Vietnam War Veterans Day in Hawaii. (HB2090 HD1)
Title
Relating To Vietnam War Veterans.
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Ito [D] | Rep. Romy Cachola [D] | Rep. Beth Fukumoto Chang [R] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
Rep. Richard Onishi [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] | Rep. Gene Ward [R] |
Rep. Justin Woodson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2018-02-13 | House | Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 318-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-02-08 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) LoPresti, Fukumoto, Cachola, Choy, Ito, Ohno, Onishi, Tokioka, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by VMI on Thursday, 02-08-18 10:00AM in House conference room 429. |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 7 |
2018-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |