HI HB2084 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows landowners and lessees of important agricultural lands to apply to the counties to develop, construct, and maintain farm cluster housing on the lands for rent to farmers and farm employees who actively and currently farm on the land, subject to certain exemptions. Removes restrictions on farm dwellings on important agricultural lands that are stricter than that for farm dwellings within agricultural districts. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Important Agricultural Lands.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - House - House Agriculture: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - House - House Agriculture: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Reported from AEN/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3478) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-22 1:50PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Re-Referred to AEN/WTL, JDC/WAM. |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Re-Referred to AEN/WTL/GVO, JDC/WAM. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred to AEN/WTL/GVO, JDC. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 313). |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McKelvey voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-04 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-22. |
2022-03-04 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 938-22) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-02-23 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 02-23-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-18 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JHA as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Kapela excused (2). |
2022-02-18 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 657-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to JHA. |
2022-02-17 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2022-02-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 02-17-22 8:30AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with Representative(s) Kapela, Okimoto, Perruso voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2022-02-08 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 101-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WAL. |
2022-02-04 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Lowen, Marten, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Perruso, Matayoshi. |
2022-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 02-04-22 10:00AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to AGR, WAL, JHA, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3052 (Same As) 2022-01-26 - Referred to AEN/WTL, WAM.