HI HB2084 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-27-18 2:40PM in conference room 423.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires HTDC to report on outreach and mentorship assistance to neighbor island innovative small businesses. Appropriates funds for the neighbor island innovation initiative program. Takes effect on 7/1/2112. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Hawaii Technology Development Corporation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-26HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-27-18 2:40PM in conference room 423.
2018-04-25HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-26-18 2:40PM in conference room 423.
2018-04-24HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-25-18 2:40PM in conference room 423.
2018-04-23HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 827).
2018-04-23SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; Galuteria, Shimabukuro Co-Chairs; L. Thielen.
2018-04-16SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609).
2018-04-16HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Evans, Keohokalole Co-Chairs; Ward.
2018-04-13SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608).
2018-04-12HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2018-04-10HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 659) in amended form (SD 1).
2018-04-10SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2018-04-06SenateOne Day Notice 04-10-18.
2018-04-06SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3658) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2018-04-04SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2018-03-29SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-18 10:30AM in conference room 211.
2018-03-16SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2018-03-16SenateReported from ETT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2957) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2018-03-12SenateThe committee(s) on ETT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ETT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria.
2018-03-08SenateThe committee(s) on ETT has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-18 1:15PM in conference room 414.
2018-03-01SenateReferred to ETT, WAM.
2018-03-01SenatePassed First Reading.
2018-03-01SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 26).
2018-02-21HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Yamane excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2018-02-21HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 768-18), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2018-02-16HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Todd, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Fukumoto, Nakamura, Yamashita, Tupola.
2018-02-14HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-16-18 3:00PM in House conference room 308.
2018-02-05HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki, Todd excused (2).
2018-02-05HouseReported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 56-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2018-01-31HouseThe committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Keohokalole, Ichiyama, Johanson, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Holt.
2018-01-29HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Wednesday, 01-31-18 10:00AM in House conference room 309.
2018-01-26HouseReferred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 7
2018-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2018-01-19HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback