HI HB2082 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-22 - Act 080, 06/21/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1181).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-22 - Act 080, 06/21/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1181).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows adopted individuals who have attained eighteen years of age, adoptive parents, and natural parents unfettered access to the adopted individual's sealed adoption records. (SD1)
Title
Adoption Records; Open Access
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-22 | Senate | Act 080, 06/21/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1181). |
2016-06-22 | House | Act 080, on 06/21/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1181). |
2016-04-26 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 658). |
2016-04-26 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, Oshiro excused (2). |
2016-04-26 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 632). |
2016-04-25 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-07-16. |
2016-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 652). |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Gabbard, Shimabukuro. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 392). |
2016-04-07 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2016-04-06 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 414) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Slom, L. Thielen). Transmitted to House. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-06-16. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3302) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2016-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) K.Kahele. |
2016-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-16 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 28). |
2016-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Har, San Buenaventura, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kong, Saiki, Tupola excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-03-03 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 698-16), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-02-23 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) San Buenaventura; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson. |
2016-02-22 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-02-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-23-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-02-18 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Har voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Luke, Nakashima, Souki excused (3). |
2016-02-18 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 427-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2016-02-12 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan, Kobayashi, Morikawa; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Oshiro; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto Chang, Tupola. |
2016-02-11 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 02-12-16 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 2 |
2016-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |