HI HB2081 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - The committee(s) on LAT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Labor & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - The committee(s) on LAT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Labor & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends section 201-13.8, Hawaii Revised Statutes, to allow the Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism to collect and analyze employer information and data.
Title
Relating To Employer Information.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | House | The committee(s) on LAT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2022-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAT on Thursday, 02-03-22 9:30AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to LAT, CPC, JHA, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3049 (Same As) 2022-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2081&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB2081_.HTM |