HI HB2067 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the offense of abuse of family or household members to provide for a lesser included petty misdemeanor offense. Allows a deferred acceptance of guilty plea in cases involving misdemeanor and petty misdemeanor abuse offenses. Requires the judiciary to submit annual reports to the legislature on the number and outcome of abuse of family or household members cases. Sunsets pilot program 6/30/2023. Takes effect 12/31/2059. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Domestic Violence.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-20 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House Human Services & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16SenateThe hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
2020-03-11SenateThe committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-20 10:00AM in conference room 016.
2020-03-05SenateThe committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-10-20 10:00AM in conference room 016.
2020-03-03SenateReferred to JDC, WAM.
2020-03-03SenatePassed First Reading.
2020-03-03SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 172).
2020-02-28HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Holt, Thielen excused (4). Transmitted to Senate.
2020-02-28HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 826-20), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2020-02-20HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2020-02-18HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-20-20 1:00PM in House conference room 308.
2020-02-14HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2).
2020-02-14HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 563-20), recommending referral to FIN.
2020-02-12HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakashima, Perruso, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2020-02-11HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-12-20 2:15PM in conference room 325.
2020-02-11HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-12-20 at 2:15PM.
2020-02-10HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-11-20 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2020-02-06HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Saiki, Yamashita excused (3).
2020-02-06HouseReported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 156-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2020-01-29HouseThe committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, Belatti, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Say.
2020-01-24HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HSH on Wednesday, 01-29-20 8:30AM in House conference room 329.
2020-01-23HouseReferred to HSH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 4
2020-01-21HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2020-01-17HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB2638 (Same As) 2020-07-02 - Forty-eight (48) hours notice Monday, 07-06-20.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback