HI HB2062 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-16 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-16 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes permanent the regulation of athletic trainers. (HB2062 HD2)
Title
Relating To Athletic Trainers.
Sponsors
Rep. Takashi Ohno [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] |
Rep. Roy Takumi [D] | Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] |
Rep. Nadine Nakamura [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-16 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 546-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-02-13 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Ito, LoPresti, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka, Yamane, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Johanson. |
2018-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-13-18 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2018-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, McDermott, Souki, Tupola, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-09 | House | Reported from IAC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 210-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2018-02-06 | House | The committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Choy, Cachola, Fukumoto, Ito, LoPresti, Onishi, Tokioka, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by IAC on Tuesday, 02-06-18 10:30AM in House conference room 429. |
2018-01-31 | House | Re-referred to IAC, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 13 |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to IAC/HHS, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2018-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2053 (Same As) 2018-06-29 - Act 058, 06/27/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1159).