HI HB2062 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-10 - (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, M. Lee excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-10 - (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, M. Lee excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the music therapy board within the department of commerce and consumer affairs. Requires licensure in order to use the title of "music therapist" or practice music therapy in the State.
Title
Music Therapy; Music Therapists; Licensure
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-10 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, M. Lee excused (2). | |
2012-02-10 | (H) Reported from CUA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 254-12), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. | |
2012-02-06 | (H) The committees on CUA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Wooley, Belatti, Hanohano, Jordan, C. Lee, Mizuno, Morikawa, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2012-02-04 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-06-12 at 11:40 am in conference room 329. | |
2012-02-04 | (H) The committee(s) on recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 2/6/12. | |
2012-02-01 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CUA on Saturday, 02-04-12 9:30AM in House conference room 329. | |
2012-01-19 | (H) Referred to CUA, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 | |
2012-01-19 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-18 | (H) Pending introduction. |