HI HB2060 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-13 - Act 253, on 07/12/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1362).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-13 - Act 253, on 07/12/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1362).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires all chief procurement officers to assist and cooperate with any compliance review by the state procurement administrator. Clarifies that the administrator has the authority to perform periodic compliance reviews of the procurement practices and procedures of all governmental bodies, in collaboration with the state procurement policy board. Establishes a fair and reasonable pricing policy for all contract actions. Clarifies that contractors are required to submit and certify cost or pricing data for certain change orders and contract modifications, even if the original contract award did not require cost and pricing data. (SD2)
Title
Procurement; Fair and Reasonable Pricing Policy; Administrator; State Procurement Board; Review
Sponsors
Rep. Aaron Johanson [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] | Rep. Scott Nishimoto [D] |
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-13 | House | Act 253, on 07/12/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1362). |
2016-07-13 | Senate | Act 253, 07/12/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1362). |
2016-05-05 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 684). |
2016-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2016-05-03 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 676). |
2016-04-29 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-14-16. |
2016-04-29 | House | The House Conference Managers recommend to agree to the Senate Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Kawakami, Johanson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-16 2:00PM in conference room 414. |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting rescheduled for 04-27-16 2:00PM in conference room 414. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-27-16 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2016-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 656). |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Kim Chair; Tokuda Co-Chair; Ihara, Slom. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Kawakami, Johanson Co-Chairs; Ward. |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2016-04-14 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2016-04-12 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 566) in amended form (SD 2). |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Transmitted to House. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-16. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3523) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2016-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, Galuteria, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-16 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3035) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2016-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Ihara, Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Tokuda, Slom. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-16 1:15PM in conference room 414. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to GVO, WAM. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 110). |
2016-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Saiki, Tupola excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 745-16), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-02-26 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen. |
2016-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-26-16 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2016-02-18 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Luke, Nakashima, Souki excused (3). |
2016-02-18 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 391-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-02-12 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Brower, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Ito, Ohno, Onishi, Tokioka, Tsuji, Woodson, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Friday, 02-12-16 10:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2016-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |