HI HB2058 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - (S) Act 061, 4/25/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 524).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - (S) Act 061, 4/25/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 524).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the natural energy laboratory of Hawaii authority to enter into concessions for cell towers. (SD1)
Title
Natural Energy Laboratory of Hawaii Authority; Cell Tower Concessions
Sponsors
Rep. Cindy Evans [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | (S) Act 061, 4/25/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 524). | |
2010-04-27 | (H) Act 061, on 4/25/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 278). | |
2010-04-16 | (S) Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 573). | |
2010-04-15 | (H) Transmitted to Governor. | |
2010-04-15 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with Representative(s) Hanohano voting no (1) and Representative(s) Har, Souki excused (2). | |
2010-04-15 | (H) House agrees to Senate amendment(s). | |
2010-04-14 | (H) Reconsideration of action taken on 04-07-10. | |
2010-04-13 | (H) The House Conference Managers recommend to agree to the Senate Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Choy, Evans, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-04-12 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-13-10 1:30PM in conference room 423. | |
2010-04-12 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 473). | |
2010-04-09 | (H) House conferees appointed: McKelvey, Choy Co-Chairs; Evans, Ward. | |
2010-04-08 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 535). | |
2010-04-08 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Fukunaga, Chair; Baker, Slom. | |
2010-04-08 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 462). | |
2010-04-07 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2010-04-06 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 420) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2010-04-06 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-04-01 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-06-10. | |
2010-04-01 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2010-04-01 | (S) Reported from EDT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2972) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2010-03-31 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Fukunaga, Baker, Ige, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hee. | |
2010-03-22 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT has scheduled a public hearing on 03-31-10 1:45PM in conference room 016. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Referred to EDT. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 76). | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 566-10), recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-18 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita, Finnegan, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Sagum. | |
2010-02-16 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-18-10 10:00AM in House conference room 308. | |
2010-02-10 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and M. Lee, Souki excused (2). | |
2010-02-10 | (H) Reported from EBM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 257-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2010-02-09 | (H) The committees on EBM recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Choy, Evans, Manahan, Takai, Tokioka, Tsuji, Wooley, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Berg, Wakai. | |
2010-02-05 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making by EBM on Tuesday, 02-09-10 8:30 am in House conference room 312. | |
2010-02-04 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 02-09-10. | |
2010-02-01 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EBM on Thursday, 02-04-10 8:00am in House conference room 312. | |
2010-01-20 | (H) Referred to EBM, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2010-01-20 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2010-01-19 | (H) Pending introduction. |