HI HB2035 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-08 - Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 417).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-08 - Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 417).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Land and Natural Resources to transfer to the Department of Agriculture certain non-agricultural park lands by a specified date. Requires lessees, permittees, and other occupants to develop and implement a watershed partnership plan and dedicate 50% of meat production for local consumption by 12/31/2023. Requires the Department of Agriculture to report on the percentage of local meat production marketed within the State and on implementation of the watershed partnership plan. Amends the definition of "agricultural activities" used in chapter 166E, Hawaii Revised Statutes. Section 3, subsections (a), (b), and (c) sunset 6/30/2021. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Non-agricultural Park Lands.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-01 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-08 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 417). |
2020-07-08 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2020-07-06 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 585) in amended form (SD 2). |
2020-07-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Ihara). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 07-06-20. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3766) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2020-07-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto. |
2020-06-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 07-01-20 9:45AM in conference room Auditorium. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 06-30-20 10:15AM in conference room Auditorium. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Reported from WTL/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3691) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) K. Rhoads; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Nishihara, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-06-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 06-24-20 12:30PM in conference room 229. |
2020-03-16 | Senate | The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-20 1:20PM in conference room 224. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Referred to WTL/AEN, WAM. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 163). |
2020-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Eli, Kitagawa, Lowen, McKelvey voting no (4) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Holt, Thielen excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 954-20), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-21 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Eli, Kitagawa; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Wildberger, McDermott. |
2020-02-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-21-20 12:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2020-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) McKelvey voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, Lowen, Perruso, Thielen, Wildberger voting no (5) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2). |
2020-02-14 | House | Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 663-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-02-13 | House | The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Tarnas, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Har. |
2020-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WLH on Thursday, 02-13-20 2:00PM in House conference room 423. |
2020-02-11 | House | Re-referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 26 |
2020-01-23 | House | Referred to WLH/AGR, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2020-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2415 (Same As) 2020-01-23 - Referred to WTL/AEN, JDC.