HI HB2033 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - Act 094, 06/29/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1195).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - Act 094, 06/29/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1195).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes service on nonresident property owners for actions involving the property owned by the nonresident through a summons mailed to the mailing address on record with the real property tax office in the county in which the property is located. (HB2033 CD1)
Title
Relating To Manner Of Service.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-05 | Senate | Act 094, 06/29/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1195). |
2018-07-05 | House | Act 094, on 06/29/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1195). |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705). |
2018-05-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2018-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849). |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2018-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2018-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 20-18). |
2018-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-01-18. |
2018-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 20-18) as amended in (CD 1). |
2018-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) K. Rhoads. |
2018-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 2 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2018-04-24 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-25-18 2:45PM in conference room 329. |
2018-04-23 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 827). |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Taniguchi Chair; Kim, K. Rhoads. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Takumi, San Buenaventura Co-Chairs; McDermott. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 388). |
2018-03-27 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-03-23 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 442) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-23-18. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3036) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-18 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 176). |
2018-03-02 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, San Buenaventura, Say, Yamane excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1002-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-22 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, C. Lee, Morikawa, Takayama, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-22-18 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2018-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 703-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2018-02-14 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Ito, Johanson, LoPresti, Mizuno, Tokioka, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Yamane. |
2018-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-14-18 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2018-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2287 (Same As) 2018-01-22 - Referred to JDC.