HI HB2029 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates a $50,000,000 revolving line of credit sub-fund under the umbrella of the green energy market securitization loan fund for any state agency or department to finance energy efficiency measures.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Energy Efficiency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-06HouseThe committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2018-01-31HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-06-18 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
2018-01-26HouseReferred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 6
2018-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2018-01-19HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB2018 (Same As) 2018-01-19 - Referred to TRE/GVO, WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback