HI HB2029 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-22 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-22 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the regulatory programs for barbers and cosmetologists, marriage and family therapists, athlete agents, hearing aid dealers and fitters, and electrologists. (HB2029 HD1)
Title
Professions and Occupations; Regulatory Boards and Programs; Repeal
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-22 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2010-02-19 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-22-10 4:35PM in House conference room 308. | |
2010-02-19 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 02-22-10. | |
2010-02-16 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-19-10 11:00AM in House conference room 308. | |
2010-02-11 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2010-02-11 | (H) Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 292-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2010-02-08 | (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Herkes, Wakai, Ito, Karamatsu, Luke, McKelvey, Mizuno, Souki, Tsuji, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla, Carroll, Morita. | |
2010-02-03 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-08-10 at 2:00 PM in conference room 325. | |
2010-02-03 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 2:00 PM on 02-08-2010. | |
2010-01-29 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-03-10 2:00pm in House conference room 325. | |
2010-01-27 | (H) Re-referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6 | |
2010-01-20 | (H) Referred to HLT/HUS, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2010-01-20 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2010-01-19 | (H) Pending introduction. |