HI HB2021 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - The committee(s) on HHH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - The committee(s) on HHH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes state-licensed and credentialed physicians, advanced practice registered nurses, and physician assistants, who are not physically in the State, to issue prescriptions for certain controlled substances under a limited circumstance. Authorizes pharmacies to dispense such prescriptions.
Title
Relating To Health.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | House | The committee(s) on HHH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2022-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Thursday, 02-03-22 9:00AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to HHH, CPC, JHA, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2152 (Same As) 2022-02-02 - The committee on HTH deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2021&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB2021_.HTM |