HI HB2015 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires a newspaper to disclose the aggregate amount spent by a candidate on advertisements with the newspaper in the election year when a newspaper chooses to endorse a candidate. (HB2015 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Transparency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-14HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
2018-02-14HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 406-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2018-02-01HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) McDermott; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, Morikawa.
2018-01-30HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-01-18 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2018-01-26HouseReferred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
2018-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2018-01-19HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback