HI HB201 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB201
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-25 - Received notice of discharge of all conferees (Hse. Com. No. 457).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-25 - Received notice of discharge of all conferees (Hse. Com. No. 457).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the definition of "historic property" for purposes of the Historic Preservation Program. Effective 6/30/3000. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Historic Preservation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-25 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of all conferees (Hse. Com. No. 457). |
2024-03-22 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2024-03-20 | House | Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 340). |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Conferee(s) discharged. |
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 837). |
2023-04-21 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Ichiyama, Tarnas Co-Chairs; Chun, Souza. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; Rhoads Co-Chair; Elefante. |
2023-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 900). |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 626). |
2023-04-05 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2023-04-04 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 553) in amended form (SD 1). |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-23. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1486) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-21-23 9:40AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1147) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2023-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante, Chang, McKelvey; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2023-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-13-23 1:00PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Referred to WTL, JDC . |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 262). |
2023-03-07 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-03-03 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-23. |
2023-03-03 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1075) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2023-03-01 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Holt, Hashimoto, Ilagan, Kong, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama. |
2023-02-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 03-01-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Marten excused (1). |
2023-02-17 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 642) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2023-01-31 | House | The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-01-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 01-31-23 9:00AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-25 | House | Referred to WAL, JHA, referral sheet 1 |
2023-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB201 (Carry Over) 2023-04-24 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 837).