HI HB201 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB201
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-04 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-04 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends or clarifies certain statutory deadlines relating to elections by mail, including the date to which the clerk must continue mailing ballot packages to voters who update their voter registration address and the date on which ballots may begin to be tabulated. Authorizes a county clerk to operate additional voter service centers with varying days or hours of operation. Provides that voters standing in line at a voter service center at the time the voter service center closes may vote or register to vote, if eligible. Authorizes a county clerk to open places for ballot deposit not earlier than the initial day that ballots are mailed.
Title
Relating To Elections.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-02 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-04 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1). |
2021-02-04 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 14), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2021-02-02 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. |
2021-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-02-21 2:00PM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB201 (Carry Over) 2021-02-04 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1).
SB423 (Same As) 2021-01-25 - Referred to JDC .
SB423 (Same As) 2021-01-25 - Referred to JDC .