HI HB1999 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-24 - Referred to AGR/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-24 - Referred to AGR/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Agriculture to conduct a market analysis study to identify the optimum mix of private sector, public sector, and philanthropic funding sources and mechanisms needed to support blue carbon ecosystem projects in the State and Pacific region. Makes an appropriation.
Title
Relating To Blue Carbon Ecosystem Projects.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to AGR/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2024-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2084 (Same As) 2024-01-18 - Referred to AEN, WAM.
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Blue Carbon Ecosystem Projects
Blue Carbon Finance
DOA
Market Analysis Study
Report to Legislature
Blue Carbon Ecosystem Projects
Blue Carbon Finance
DOA
Market Analysis Study
Report to Legislature
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1999&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB1999_.HTM |