HI HB1997 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-08 - Act 229, 07/07/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1331).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Implements the recommendation of the Hawaii Agriculture Workforce Advisory Board to create an agriculture workforce development pipeline initiative to conduct training on all islands for teachers and school administrators in agricultural self-sufficiency. (HB1997 CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Agriculture; Workforce Development Pipeline Initiative; Appropriation ($)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-07-08SenateAct 229, 07/07/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1331).
2016-07-08HouseAct 229, on 07/07/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1331).
2016-05-05HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2016-05-05SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 685).
2016-05-04HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 715).
2016-05-03SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2016-05-03HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2016-04-29Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-16.
2016-04-29SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 94-16).
2016-04-29HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-16.
2016-04-29HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 94-16) as amended in (CD 1).
2016-04-28SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Keith-Agaran, Dela Cruz; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Slom.
2016-04-28HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Nakashima, Onishi; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Matsumoto.
2016-04-27HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-28-16 3:35PM in conference room 224.
2016-04-25HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-27-16 3:35PM in conference room 224.
2016-04-22HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-25-16 3:35PM in conference room 224.
2016-04-19SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611).
2016-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 652).
2016-04-18HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Tsuji, Nakashima, Onishi Co-Chairs; Matsumoto.
2016-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Kidani, Keith-Agaran, Dela Cruz Co-Chairs; Slom.
2016-04-15SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 609).
2016-04-14HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2016-04-12HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 550) in amended form (SD 1).
2016-04-12SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Transmitted to House.
2016-04-08Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-16.
2016-04-08SenateReported from JDL/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3554) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2016-04-04SenateThe committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) K.Kahele, Kim, L. Thielen.
2016-04-04SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English.
2016-04-01SenateThe committee(s) on JDL/WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-16 9:15AM in conference room 211.
2016-03-23SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL/WAM.
2016-03-23SenateReported from WLA/EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3007) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDL/WAM.
2016-03-18SenateThe committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, K.Kahele, Riviere, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz.
2016-03-18SenateThe committee(s) on WLA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WLA were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Riviere, L. Thielen, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Ruderman, Shimabukuro.
2016-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on WLA/EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-16 2:55PM in conference room 224.
2016-03-10SenateReferred to WLA/EDU, JDL/WAM.
2016-03-04SenatePassed First Reading.
2016-03-04SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 24).
2016-03-03HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kong, Saiki, Tupola excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
2016-03-03HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 671-16), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2016-02-25HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite.
2016-02-23HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-25-16 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
2016-02-18HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Luke, Nakashima, Souki excused (3).
2016-02-18HouseReported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 472-16), recommending referral to FIN.
2016-02-16HouseThe committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Aquino, Har, Ichiyama, Johanson, LoPresti, San Buenaventura, Takumi, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2016-02-12HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-16-16 10:00AM in House conference room 309.
2016-02-12HousePassed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on LAB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1).
2016-02-12HouseReported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 230-16), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LAB.
2016-02-10HouseThe committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Onishi, Brower, Kong, Ohno, Woodson, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Ito, Kawakami, Tokioka.
2016-02-10HouseThe votes in AGR were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Onishi, Brower, Kong, Ohno, Woodson, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Ito, Kawakami, Tokioka.
2016-02-10HouseReconsideration of action taken on 02-04-16.
2016-02-08HouseBill scheduled for reconsideration of previous decision by AGR on 02-10-16 10:20AM in conference room 312.
2016-02-04HouseThe committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Onishi, Brower, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Ito, Kawakami, Kong, Ohno, Tokioka, Woodson, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2016-02-01HouseBill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Thursday, 02-04-16 8:30AM in House conference room 312.
2016-01-27HouseReferred to AGR, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 2
2016-01-25HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2016-01-22HousePending introduction.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback