HI HB1994 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-16 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy, Har, Matsumoto, McDermott, Thielen, Tokioka, Tupola, Ward voting no (8) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-16 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy, Har, Matsumoto, McDermott, Thielen, Tokioka, Tupola, Ward voting no (8) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits state law enforcement agencies from complying with federal immigration detainers or honoring requests for non-public information unless specifically required to do so by a warrant signed by a judge or provisions of federal, state, or local law. (HB1994 HD2)
Title
Relating To Law Enforcement.
Sponsors
Rep. Kaniela Ing [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] |
Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-16 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy, Har, Matsumoto, McDermott, Thielen, Tokioka, Tupola, Ward voting no (8) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 748-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-02-15 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, Morikawa, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; 2 Noes: Representative(s) McDermott, Thielen; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee. |
2018-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-15-18 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2018-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Evans, Har, Hashem, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy, Matsumoto, McDermott, Thielen, Ward voting no (5) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola excused (2). |
2018-02-08 | House | Reported from PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 187-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2018-02-01 | House | The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Gates, Creagan, DeCoite, Ing, Say; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Thielen; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 02-01-18 10:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to PBS, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2018-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2290 (Same As) 2018-03-08 - Referred to PBS, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 35
Subjects
Federal Immigration Enforcement
Law Enforcement Agencies
United States Customs and Border Protection
United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Law Enforcement Agencies
United States Customs and Border Protection
United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement