HI HB1990 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-01 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Alcos, Kitagawa excused (2).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-01 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Alcos, Kitagawa excused (2).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a regulatory framework for the sale of travel insurance in the State. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Travel Insurance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Alcos, Kitagawa excused (2). |
2024-02-01 | House | Reported from TOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2024-01-30 | House | The committee on TOU recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Hussey-Burdick, Holt, Kong, La Chica, Lamosao, Nakamura; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Pierick; and Excused: none. |
2024-01-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TOU on Tuesday, 01-30-24 10:00AM in House conference room 423 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to TOU, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2024-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2913 (Same As) 2024-04-26 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-24 2:05PM; Conference Room 224.