HI HB1984 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-27 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 687).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-27 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 687).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the commission on water resource management to conduct an update of the statewide framework for updating the Hawaii water plan to provide additional guidance for updating the Hawaii water plan. Makes an appropriation. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Water Security.
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-27 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 687). |
2018-04-26 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2018-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-27-18 3:15PM in conference room 224. |
2018-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-26-18 3:15PM in conference room 224. |
2018-04-24 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-25-18 2:50PM in conference room 224. |
2018-04-17 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 787). |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: K. Rhoads Chair; English Co-Chair; Riviere. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Yamane, C. Lee, Todd Co-Chairs; Kong, Thielen. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2018-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 634) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-18. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3638) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-18 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3066) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Riviere, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-18 3:01PM in conference room 224. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 168). |
2018-03-02 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, San Buenaventura, Say, Yamane excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 996-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-28-18 12:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported from WAL/EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 580-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-02-14 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Kong, McKelvey, Todd, Yamane, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-02-14 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Cullen, Kong, C. Lee, Lowen, McKelvey, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL/EEP on Wednesday, 02-14-18 10:45AM in House conference room 325. |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to WAL/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2018-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Climate Change
Commission on Water Resource Management
Hawaii Water Plan Statewide Framework Update
Climate Change
Commission on Water Resource Management
Hawaii Water Plan Statewide Framework Update