HI HB1964 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-08 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-08 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that a current GET license number for any rental income be filed with the complaint to the court for summary possession proceedings. Requires the judiciary to submit an annual list of certain information regarding summary possession cases to the department of taxation.
Title
Related To Summary Possession.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-08 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2022-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-08-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to CPC, JHA, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1964&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB1964_.HTM |